NY S04135 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.636
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.636
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Newburgh, in the county of Orange, to offer police officer Samuel Kenan Jr. an optional 20 year retirement plan.
Title
Authorizes the city of Newburgh, in the county of Orange, to offer police officer Samuel Kenan Jr. an optional 20 year retirement plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.636 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.455 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7014a |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1546 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4135A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07014 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.636