NY S04139 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the thruway authority to enter into mutual assistance agreements with municipalities and outdoor organizations for the assistance of motorists on the thruway during an emergency; authorizes the thruway authority to reimburse such municipalities and organizations for actual expenses incurred in rendering such services.
Title
Authorizes the thruway authority to enter into mutual assistance agreements with municipalities and outdoor organizations for the assistance of motorists on the thruway during an emergency; authorizes the thruway authority to reimburse such municipalities and organizations for actual expenses incurred in rendering such services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2015-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-03-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-03-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.276 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07361 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions