NY S04173 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a city of one million or more to provide tax and rent relief to senior citizens based on the metered use of water in a dwelling unit.
Title
Allows a city of one million or more to provide tax and rent relief to senior citizens based on the metered use of water in a dwelling unit.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Klein [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.922 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-04-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-04-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-04-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.334 |
2011-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A01801 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to aging