NY S04175 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes municipalities to treat unpaid fines for building code and fire code violations as unpaid real property taxes and to impose a tax lien therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes municipalities to treat unpaid fines for building code and fire code violations as unpaid real property taxes and to impose a tax lien therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15Assemblyreferred to real property taxation
2019-05-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-07Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.570
2019-03-04SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A01820 (Same As) 2019-01-17 - referred to real property taxation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback