NY S04198 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-02 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-02 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes distinctive license plates for recipients of the Bronze or Silver star.
Title
Authorizes distinctive license plates for recipients of the Bronze or Silver star.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2014-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.658 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2013-03-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01631 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to transportation