NY S04209 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-17 - VETOED MEMO.46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-17 - VETOED MEMO.46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates uniformed officers of the fire marshal's office of the town of Huntington as peace officers.
Title
Designates uniformed officers of the fire marshal's office of the town of Huntington as peace officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-17 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.46 |
2011-08-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.570 |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | substituted for a6600 |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1311 |
2011-06-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A06600 (Same As) 2011-06-22 - substituted by s4209