NY S04230 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to assessments of special franchise property owned by water works corporations.
Title
Relates to assessments of special franchise property owned by water works corporations.
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] |
Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2019-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.934 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4230B |
2019-05-23 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-04-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4230A |
2019-04-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06543 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to real property taxation