NY S04235 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1093C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1093C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a task force on disasters; provides that such task force shall consist of twenty-three members.
Title
Creates a task force on disasters; provides that such task force shall consist of twenty-three members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1093C |
2014-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1602 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4235B |
2014-06-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2014-06-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-03-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4235A |
2014-03-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2013-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A01093 (Same As) 2014-12-17 - tabled