NY S04245 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that judges be enrolled members of the party for which they are running in the primary election or to have received a proper certificate of authorization filed properly according to the election law.
Title
Requires that judges be enrolled members of the party for which they are running in the primary election or to have received a proper certificate of authorization filed properly according to the election law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-03-03 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-03-02 | 1ST REPORT CAL.210 | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS | |
2009-07-16 | COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-05-04 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-04-29 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-04-28 | 1ST REPORT CAL.235 | |
2009-04-20 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A3126 (Same As) 2009-06-15 - ordered to third reading rules cal.226
A9421 (Same As) 2010-06-09 - held for consideration in election law
A9421 (Same As) 2010-06-09 - held for consideration in election law