NY S04264 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6243
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6243
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from November 30, 2013 to November 30, 2015, the authorization granted to the county of Steuben to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Title
Extends from November 30, 2013 to November 30, 2015, the authorization granted to the county of Steuben to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6243 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.856 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06243 (Same As) 2013-08-19 - signed chap.318