NY S04266 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2122A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2122A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the transfer and conveyance of certain unused state land consisting of a portion of the Rockland Psychiatric Center to Joseph's Home, Inc.
Title
Relates to the transfer and conveyance of certain unused state land consisting of a portion of the Rockland Psychiatric Center to Joseph's Home, Inc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2122A |
2015-05-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.723 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-05-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4266A |
2015-05-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A02122 (Same As) 2015-09-25 - signed chap.246