NY S04278 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-08 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-08 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates an animal population control fund to fund the animal population control program which reduces the population of unwanted stray dogs and cats; encourages neutering of animals.
Title
Creates an animal population control fund to fund the animal population control program which reduces the population of unwanted stray dogs and cats; encourages neutering of animals.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Duane [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. George Onorato [D] | Sen. John Sampson [D] |
Sen. Eric Schneiderman [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE | |
2009-06-02 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2009-04-21 | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A6158-A (Same As) 2010-01-06 - referred to agriculture