NY S04278 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5519C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5519C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts fire vehicles from the weight restrictions of other vehicles.
Title
Exempts fire vehicles from the weight restrictions of other vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5519C |
2015-06-01 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4278C |
2015-05-27 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4278B |
2015-05-18 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4278A |
2015-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.524 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05519 (Same As) 2015-12-11 - signed chap.526