NY S04305 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-26 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-26 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes, for the purpose of payment of restitution or reparation, within the definition of the term "victim" any person or entity which provides assistance for the prevention or mitigation of damage to person or property caused by an offense.
Title
Includes, for the purpose of payment of restitution or reparation, within the definition of the term "victim" any person or entity which provides assistance for the prevention or mitigation of damage to person or property caused by an offense.
Sponsors
Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. Owen Johnson [R] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
Sen. James Seward [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-03-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-03-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.421 |
2012-01-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4305A |
2012-01-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.724 |
2011-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A06126 (Same As) 2012-01-10 - print number 6126a