NY S04319 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-06 - PRINT NUMBER 4319A
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-06 - PRINT NUMBER 4319A
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "independent senior housing resident freedom of choice act" to authorize persons in independent housing, shelters and residences to receive services they could otherwise receive if they resided in a private residence.
Title
Enacts the "independent senior housing resident freedom of choice act" to authorize persons in independent housing, shelters and residences to receive services they could otherwise receive if they resided in a private residence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4319A |
2012-03-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGING |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-04-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-04-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-04-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.335 |
2011-03-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A07309 (Same As) 2012-05-30 - print number 7309b