NY S04350 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.291
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.291
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes technical corrections to the banking law.
Title
Makes technical corrections to the banking law.
Sponsors
Sen. Hugh Farley [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.291 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.225 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a9851 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.910 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4350A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2013-04-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-04-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-04-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.430 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A09851 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - substituted by s4350a