NY S04362 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.348
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.348
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants the village of Westbury retroactive real property tax exempt status for property located at 255 Schenck Avenue, village of Westbury, town of North Hempstead, county of Nassau.
Title
Grants the village of Westbury retroactive real property tax exempt status for property located at 255 Schenck Avenue, village of Westbury, town of North Hempstead, county of Nassau.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.348 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.259 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a4747a |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2019-05-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.571 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4362A |
2019-03-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A04747 (Same As) 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.348