NY S04400 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - PRINT NUMBER 4400B
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - PRINT NUMBER 4400B
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each institution within the state university of New York and the city university of New York to have at least one vending machine making emergency contraception available for purchase.
Title
Requires each institution within the state university of New York and the city university of New York to have at least one vending machine making emergency contraception available for purchase.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4400B |
2024-04-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2023-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4400A |
2023-05-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2023-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04091 (Same As) 2024-04-05 - print number 4091a