NY S04401 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits any person from smoking at a playground; provides a definition as to what constitutes a playground.
Title
Prohibits any person from smoking at a playground; provides a definition as to what constitutes a playground.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-04-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-04-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.390 |
2011-04-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |