NY S04422 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A989B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A989B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures that each state agency create a link to health care proxy information on state agency websites that have significant public interaction and deal with public health issues.
Title
Ensures that each state agency create a link to health care proxy information on state agency websites that have significant public interaction and deal with public health issues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A989B |
2013-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4422B |
2013-06-03 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-03 | Senate | returned to senate |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2013-05-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-04-29 | Senate | AMENDED 4422A |
2013-04-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.418 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A00989 (Same As) 2013-07-31 - signed chap.178