NY S04451 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the elimination of fees and renewal fees associated with the issuance of distinctive license plates for purple heart recipients.
Title
Relates to the elimination of fees and renewal fees associated with the issuance of distinctive license plates for purple heart recipients.
Sponsors
Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. John Bonacic [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] |
Sen. Terry Gipson [D] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.830 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4451A |
2013-05-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2013-04-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01526 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to transportation