NY S04462 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-10 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-10 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the division of criminal justice services to promulgate safety standards and training requirements for the protection of law enforcement staff against biological hazards posed by spitting of persons in custody.
Title
Directs the division of criminal justice services to promulgate safety standards and training requirements for the protection of law enforcement staff against biological hazards posed by spitting of persons in custody.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.516 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04566 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.151