NY S04468 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the reimbursement of local services provided to persons with a disability; provides for retroactive reimbursement if local services were furnished prior to approval.
Title
Relates to the reimbursement of local services provided to persons with a disability; provides for retroactive reimbursement if local services were furnished prior to approval.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | referred to people with disabilities |
2021-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4468A |
2021-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.810 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00183 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means