NY S04476 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to payment of moneys due for prior years; provides that if a school district is owed funds on the prior year adjustment list maintained by the department, prior to deducting any money, the department shall first offset the overpayment amount by the total amount owed on such list regardless of the district's priority date status.
Title
Relates to payment of moneys due for prior years; provides that if a school district is owed funds on the prior year adjustment list maintained by the department, prior to deducting any money, the department shall first offset the overpayment amount by the total amount owed on such list regardless of the district's priority date status.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Assembly | referred to education |
2018-03-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.575 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1631 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06710 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to education