NY S04520 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-09 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-09 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends murder in the first degree to include victims who are members of the military or reserves.
Title
Extends murder in the first degree to include victims who are members of the military or reserves.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-05-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-03 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4520B |
2016-03-31 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4520A |
2016-02-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-02-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.141 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1306 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A06807 (Same As) 2016-05-13 - print number 6807a