NY S04523 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-03 - PRINT NUMBER 4523B
Pending: Senate Infrastructure and Capital Investments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-03 - PRINT NUMBER 4523B
Pending: Senate Infrastructure and Capital Investments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the broadband internet access act of 2014; provides a tax credit for the delivery of current generation broadband and next generation broadband.
Title
Creates the broadband internet access act of 2014; provides a tax credit for the delivery of current generation broadband and next generation broadband.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4523B |
2014-02-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INFRASTRUCTURE AND CAPITAL INVESTMENT |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INFRASTRUCTURE AND CAPITAL INVESTMENT |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4523A |
2013-06-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INFRASTRUCTURE AND CAPITAL INVESTMENT |
2013-04-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INFRASTRUCTURE AND CAPITAL INVESTMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06923 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to ways and means
A09905 (Same As) 2014-05-27 - referred to ways and means
A09905 (Same As) 2014-05-27 - referred to ways and means