NY S04532 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 4532A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 4532A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to directing the commissioner of health to make recommendations relating to increasing certain ambulatory patient group reimbursement rates.
Title
Relates to directing the commissioner of health to make recommendations relating to increasing certain ambulatory patient group reimbursement rates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4532A |
2018-01-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A06157 (Same As) 2018-04-25 - enacting clause stricken