NY S04545 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates uniformed officers of the fire marshal's office of the town of Huntington as peace officers.
Title
Designates uniformed officers of the fire marshal's office of the town of Huntington as peace officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7080 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1050 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2013-04-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A07080 (Same As) 2014-11-21 - tabled