NY S04550 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - PRINT NUMBER 4550A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - PRINT NUMBER 4550A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "schools impacted by gross highways (SIGH) act"; prohibits the commissioner of education from approving the plans for the erection of any new schoolhouse within five hundred feet of a controlled-access highway unless the commissioner of education determines that space limitations are so severe that there is no other site to erect such new schoolhouse.
Title
Enacts the "schools impacted by gross highways (SIGH) act"; prohibits the commissioner of education from approving the plans for the erection of any new schoolhouse within five hundred feet of a controlled-access highway unless the commissioner of education determines that space limitations are so severe that there is no other site to erect such new schoolhouse.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. George Borrello [R] | Sen. Jabari Brisport [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. John Mannion [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4550A |
2024-04-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.787 |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a3287 |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
2023-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1480 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-02-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |