NY S04558 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-25 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-25 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the New York city housing authority, in reviewing applicants, to grant homeless domestic violence victims the same preference as granted the homeless.
Title
Requires the New York city housing authority, in reviewing applicants, to grant homeless domestic violence victims the same preference as granted the homeless.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2016-02-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-02-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-02-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.145 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2015-05-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.499 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4558A |
2015-04-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2015-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07268 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to housing