NY S04575 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a program to provide education and training to individuals fifty years of age and older regarding the transition to an entrepreneur and small business developer.
Title
Establishes a program to provide education and training to individuals fifty years of age and older regarding the transition to an entrepreneur and small business developer.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] |
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. James Sanders [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | tabled |
2019-11-25 | Senate | vetoed memo.153 |
2019-11-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.731 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4575 |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-15 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-09 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.310 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-12 | Senate | reference changed to small business |
2019-04-12 | Senate | referred to economic development |
2019-05-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7206 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.731 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A07206 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - tabled