NY S04586 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to instant run-off elections in cities with a population of one million or more.
Title
Relates to instant run-off elections in cities with a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1766 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4586A |
2016-01-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2015-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1121 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05571 (Same As) 2016-04-25 - print number 5571a