NY S04603 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-13 - SIGNED CHAP.505
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-13 - SIGNED CHAP.505
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the Hopewell Volunteer Fire Department, Inc. from the law requiring that the percentage of non-resident members not exceed 45%.
Title
Exempts the Hopewell Volunteer Fire Department, Inc. from the law requiring that the percentage of non-resident members not exceed 45%.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.505 |
2013-11-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.536 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7200 |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2013-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.545 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07200 (Same As) 2013-06-20 - substituted by s4603