NY S04610 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7916A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7916A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires builders of one- and two-family dwellings having less than 3 stories to provide buyers with information on the installation and maintenance of automatic fire sprinkler systems.
Title
Requires builders of one- and two-family dwellings having less than 3 stories to provide buyers with information on the installation and maintenance of automatic fire sprinkler systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7916A |
2014-06-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4610A |
2014-06-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.945 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2013-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1530 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A07916 (Same As) 2014-08-05 - signed chap.201