NY S04634 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.352
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Includes SUNY police officers for purposes of presumption regarding impairment caused by heart disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Includes SUNY police officers for purposes of presumption regarding impairment caused by heart disease.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblyVETOED MEMO.352
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-05-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-05-08Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-08Assemblyordered to third reading cal.837
2018-05-08Assemblysubstituted for a6413a
2018-04-23Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-04-23SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-04-23SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-03-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-02-28Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-02-27Senate1ST REPORT CAL.525
2018-01-23SenatePRINT NUMBER 4634A
2018-01-23SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-05-02Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-05-02SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-05-02SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-04-26SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-04-25Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-04-24Senate1ST REPORT CAL.564
2017-02-23SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06413 (Same As) 2018-05-08 - substituted by s4634a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04634&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04634&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04634
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04634&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04634A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S4634#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S4634#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S4634#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S4634#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04634&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback