NY S04664 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-10 - APPROVAL MEMO.18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-10 - APPROVAL MEMO.18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to imposing sentences of probation and to waiving pre-sentence investigations and written reports thereon in any city having a population of one million or more for certain offenses.
Title
Relates to imposing sentences of probation and to waiving pre-sentence investigations and written reports thereon in any city having a population of one million or more for certain offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-10 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.18 |
2014-01-10 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.556 |
2013-12-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.189 |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a4582b |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1351 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4664A |
2013-05-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2013-04-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04582 (Same As) 2013-06-19 - substituted by s4664a