NY S04689 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the municipal police training council to develop policies and procedures regarding the use of internet technology and the use of such technology to perpetuate harassment or other crimes.
Title
Requires the municipal police training council to develop policies and procedures regarding the use of internet technology and the use of such technology to perpetuate harassment or other crimes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-08-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4689A |
2019-08-09 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2019-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A01348 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - amended on third reading (t) 1348b