NY S04717 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.368
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.368
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for the establishment of an occupancy tax in the city of Port Jervis of up to three percent.
Title
Allows for the establishment of an occupancy tax in the city of Port Jervis of up to three percent.
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.368 |
2020-12-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | home rule request |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.303 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted for a6079a |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.883 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1505 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4717A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06079 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.368