NY S04723 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - VETOED MEMO.223
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - VETOED MEMO.223
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the powers and duties of the receiver of taxes and assessments and school boards.
Title
Relates to the powers and duties of the receiver of taxes and assessments and school boards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.223 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.380 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a4587a |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2017-05-22 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4723A |
2017-05-22 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-22 | Senate | returned to senate |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2017-03-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.461 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A04587 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - substituted by s4723a