NY S04723 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes, under certain circumstances, full-time college and university students to act as election inspectors and poll clerks in the election district where their college or university is located.
Title
Authorizes, under certain circumstances, full-time college and university students to act as election inspectors and poll clerks in the election district where their college or university is located.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2021-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1445 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-02-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00482 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to election law