NY S04725 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-13 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-13 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the financial exploitation of the elderly or disabled within the definition of the crime of larceny; defines terms.
Title
Includes the financial exploitation of the elderly or disabled within the definition of the crime of larceny; defines terms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1233 |
2012-03-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-03-12 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1341 |
2011-06-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A02374 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to codes