NY S04728 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-15 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-15 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from sales tax the sale of an abstract of title to real property to be used for agricultural purposes to either a prospective purchaser of real property or to an attorney representing a prospective purchaser.
Title
Exempts from sales tax the sale of an abstract of title to real property to be used for agricultural purposes to either a prospective purchaser of real property or to an attorney representing a prospective purchaser.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-05-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.730 |
2012-01-19 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4728A |
2012-01-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.618 |
2011-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A07658 (Same As) 2012-01-25 - print number 7658a