NY S04732 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the amount of money a retiree may earn in a position of public service in the year 2014 and thereafter to $32,500.
Title
Increases the amount of money a retiree may earn in a position of public service in the year 2014 and thereafter to $32,500.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4732A |
2014-06-19 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2014-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2014-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.986 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2013-04-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06801 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to governmental employees