NY S04736 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the effectiveness of the additional beverage containers to the environmental conservation law; repeals certain provisions of the environmental conservation law related thereto; requires the commissioner of environmental conservation to submit a report on fraud and improper redemption.
Title
Relates to the effectiveness of the additional beverage containers to the environmental conservation law; repeals certain provisions of the environmental conservation law related thereto; requires the commissioner of environmental conservation to submit a report on fraud and improper redemption.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. Pedro Espada [D] | Sen. Carl Kruger [D] | Sen. William Stachowski [D] |
Sen. David Valesky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2009-07-16 | COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-05-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-05-18 | AMENDED (T) 4736B | |
2009-05-13 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-12 | 1ST REPORT CAL.298 | |
2009-04-30 | PRINT NUMBER 4736A | |
2009-04-30 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO FINANCE |