NY S04738 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6978
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6978
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions of law relating to the resolution of labor disputes.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions of law relating to the resolution of labor disputes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6978 |
2015-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.554 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06978 (Same As) 2015-06-30 - signed chap.28