NY S04740 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds to the crime of public lewdness the electronic transmission of an image depicting exposed private or intimate parts without the consent of the recipient.
Title
Adds to the crime of public lewdness the electronic transmission of an image depicting exposed private or intimate parts without the consent of the recipient.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Nathalia Fernandez [D] | Sen. Monica Martinez [D] | Sen. Dean Murray [R] |
Sen. Anthony Palumbo [R] | Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-03-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.474 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4740A |
2023-03-02 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2023-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A00319 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to codes