NY S04747 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires appearance enhancement business owners to provide masks and gloves to nail specialists.
Title
Requires appearance enhancement business owners to provide masks and gloves to nail specialists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - WITHDRAWN | |
2010-05-03 | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | |
2009-07-16 | COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-07-09 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4747A | |
2009-06-04 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-06-03 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-06-02 | 1ST REPORT CAL.582 | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |