NY S04749 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the collection of prescription drug co-payments at the point of sale in pharmacies.
Title
Requires the collection of prescription drug co-payments at the point of sale in pharmacies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | Assembly | referred to health |
2012-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1276 |
2012-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | referred to health |
2011-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-06-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1142 |
2011-04-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07727 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to health