NY S04750 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Chenango to apply to the federal government to establish, operate and maintain foreign trade zones within such county.
Title
Authorizes the county of Chenango to apply to the federal government to establish, operate and maintain foreign trade zones within such county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.569 |
2011-09-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.482 |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a7248 |
2011-05-18 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2011-05-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.643 |
2011-04-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07248 (Same As) 2011-06-01 - substituted by s4750