NY S04811 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5287
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5287
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing certain health care professionals licensed to practice in other jurisdictions to practice in this state in connection with an event sanctioned by New York Road Runners; extends the provisions thereof.
Title
Relates to authorizing certain health care professionals licensed to practice in other jurisdictions to practice in this state in connection with an event sanctioned by New York Road Runners; extends the provisions thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5287 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.413 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05287 (Same As) 2017-05-22 - signed chap.29